Trustees HOUGHTON REGIS HERITAGE SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1174720

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HILL | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|||||
James Carroll | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Dominic Bolan | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Lorna Morison | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Aganoglu | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
JANET EILEEN SMY | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER TURNER | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY MCMAHON | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DUDLEY SMY | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.