SOLVA CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set up in response to wishes of the local residents, we support individuals and families with a variety of services and aim to maintain and improve health and wellbeing by: Enabling residents to stay in their own homes and remain part of the community. Offer a way to counteract loneliness, isolation and social disadvantage. Provide extra support for those who are caring for relatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 04 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOLLIE ROACH | Chair | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Maggie McKenzie | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Carnes Chichlowska | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Griffin | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Holland | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Bale | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Denman | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA YOUNG | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||
JONATHON CROWTHER HIGGINS | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.45k | £221.39k | £127.25k | £232.16k | £288.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.99k | £107.48k | £165.98k | £227.22k | £230.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.04k | £16.05k | £8.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2017 as amended on 06 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND OTHERS WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING SPECIALLY DESIGNED SOCIAL CARE SUPPORT SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS IN PEMBROKESHIRE BUT INITIALLY CENTRED ON SOLVA AND ITS IMMEDIATE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Valley
Wiston
HAVERFORDWEST
SA62 4PJ
- Phone:
- 07890987259
- Email:
- brucepayne241@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window