Trustees SOLVA CARE
Charity number: 1172878

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOLLIE ROACH | Chair | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Maggie McKenzie | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Carnes Chichlowska | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Griffin | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Holland | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Bale | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Denman | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA YOUNG | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|||||
JONATHON CROWTHER HIGGINS | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.