Financial history NETHER STOWEY VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1176413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.66k £33.06k £40.43k £73.33k £20.27k
Total expenditure £25.39k £22.10k £30.74k £62.44k £30.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.13k £19.67k £10.67k £50.00k N/A