THE PETERBOROUGH SOUP KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peterborough Soup Kitchen is a local charity for homeless and disadvantaged people from in and around the city.? Our aim is to ensure that anybody who turns up at our serving van receives hot soup, food and drinks throughout the year, whatever the weather conditions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 12 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAXINE DRAKE MS | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Maryana Stevens | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Tyler | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ricky Barsby | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ribakovs | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Sinclair Winchester | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.89k | £47.27k | £43.97k | £64.54k | £45.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.30k | £28.82k | £56.39k | £43.32k | £44.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 November 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PETERBOROUGH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 245
PETERBOROUGH
PE3 9DW
- Phone:
- 01733315456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window