Trustees Skills & Volunteering Cymru (SVC)
Charity Number: 1173198

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heidi Alice Smith | Chair | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Conway | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ruth Madden | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Huw Rhys Williams | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Marie Hughes | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca King | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Ahmed | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nina Di Cara | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Claire John | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Fish | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Ann Mathison | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Eleri Perridge | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly-Marie Fenton | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Henry George Morris | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Perry Vass | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN HARVEY-COOKE | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gavin James Hawkey | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.