ADHARA AUTISM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adhara's vision is to advance the education of children and young people with autism in Southampton and Hampshire to ensure a positive outcome. Adhara will improve understanding of autism amongst autistic children and young people, their families and key people by providing information, equipment, access to specialists and learning and development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56 | £56 | £883 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £105 | £156 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 155 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF AUTISM AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF UNDERSTANDING AUTISM AND TO PUBLISH OR SUPPORT THE PUBLICATION OF USEFUL RESULTS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM (INCLUDING THOSE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUST SEES FIT, INCLUDING BY: - AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTE OF HIGHER EDUCATION; - AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS FUNDING TO SUPPORT SPECIFIC AUTISM-RELATED NEEDS WHICH AID PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT FOR INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS; - PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY INTO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; - ASSISTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WITH AUTISM (INCLUDING THOSE UNDER THE AGE OF 18) BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH EDUCATIONAL AND/OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES; - PROMOTING THE LEARNING (INCLUDING FOR PLEASURE) OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL-TIME EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window