Financial history NATURAL KIRKLEES

Charity number: 1174259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £10.00k £22.96k £36.02k £40.29k
Total expenditure £13.77k £13.99k £12.45k £37.51k £10.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £10.00k £22.00k £35.00k £33.00k