Financial history NO PANIC SUTTON AND MERTON

Charity Number: 1175831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.45k £11.43k £15.51k £15.56k £16.22k
Total expenditure £8.44k £10.08k £11.72k £12.62k £15.33k
Income from government contracts £15.00k £11.25k £15.00k £15.00k £16.22k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A