Shakespeare North Playhouse Capital Campaign

Charity number: 1172498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helping to raise the required capital funding to build the Shakespeare North Playhouse in Prescot, Merseyside.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,171
Total expenditure: £1,287,325

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Knowsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SHAKESPEARE NORTH PLAYHOUSE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RT HON GEORGE EDWARD HOWARTH MP Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record
ALISON JANE HASTINGS Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record
Sir Terry Leahy Trustee 21 February 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £527.04k £326.44k £256.14k £209.14k £9.17k
Total expenditure £80 £17.35k £13.30k £312 £1.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £527.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £80 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £80 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 February 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 February 2023 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 March 2022 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Head Of Finance
3rd Floor
Municipal Buildings
Knowsley Council
Archway Road
HUYTON
Phone:
0151 443 3622
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available