Financial history HAVERFORDWEST RACECOURSE (PUBLIC PARK) TRUST

Charity number: 509842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.57k £14.31k £7.03k £22.36k £12.36k
Total expenditure £14.82k £8.90k £8.43k £10.54k £9.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A