Accounts and annual returns DEAF SPORTS FIRST

Charity number: 1175408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 August 2019 23 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2019 23 February 2020 On Time Download Open in new window