Financial history DEAF SPORTS FIRST

Charity number: 1175408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £41.55k £2.28k £0 £200 £59.85k
Total expenditure £39.53k £1.69k £193 £416 £57.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A