GLOSSOP WOMEN'S AID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A free, community based service in the High Peak for women and children experiencing the efects of domestic abuse. These include: Refuge accommodation outreach service Childrens Support Counselling service Telephone helpline Domestic abuse awareness training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 02 April 1980: Standard registration
- 13 April 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 13 April 2011: Funds transferred to 1134679 CROSSROADS DERBYSHIRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.35k | £246.22k | £268.06k | £284.22k | £296.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.62k | £212.50k | £237.78k | £261.87k | £292.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 11 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 31 October 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS, AMONG WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED BY THEIR HUSBANDS OR BY THE MEN WITH WHOM THEY ARE, OR HAVE BEEN LIVING, AND AMONG THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window