OXFORD CENTRE FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN PALLIATIVE CARE: SOBELL HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Charity is to support patient care by developing and educating health and social care staff to deliver care of high quality. Research supports patient care by looking at evidence, posing questions and seeking to find answers which will change practice. This work happens at local, national and international level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Symons | Chair | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Anne Laurence | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tim Harrison | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHARON YATES | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £338.54k | £152.02k | £408.49k | £347.95k | £398.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.09k | £234.97k | £306.13k | £425.05k | £349.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST THOSE WORKING IN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE) IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PALLIATIVE CARE AND/OR PAIN RELIEF; AND/OR 1.1.2 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF PALLIATIVE CARE AND/OR PAIN RELIEF AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND/OR 1.1.3 TO RELIEVE THE NEED AND/OR TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF SOBELL HOUSE IN OXFORDSHIRE, AND IN ANY OTHER PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OxCERPC
Palliative Care Department
Sobell House
Churchill Hospital
OX3 7LE
- Phone:
- 01865225886
- Email:
- ssc@ouh.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window