Financial history RAISE YOUR HANDS

Charity number: 1174956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £590.04k £281.46k £293.09k £885.97k £869.07k
Total expenditure £486.13k £424.92k £279.86k £544.82k £774.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £163.54k N/A N/A £857.43k £825.25k
Income - Other trading activities £426.48k N/A N/A £28.54k £42.50k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other £21 N/A N/A £0 £1.32k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £348.69k N/A N/A £396.28k £594.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds £137.44k N/A N/A £148.54k £179.67k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £5.16k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £188.74k N/A N/A £289.29k £437.36k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0