Accounts and annual returns THE SPENCER LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 509863
Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days
Annual return 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days
Annual return 01 June 2021 20 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 June 2020 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Not Required