ECCLES BOROUGH BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a brass band concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY HAMER | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alington | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Squibbs | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.30k | £16.38k | £21.07k | £7.88k | £8.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.10k | £7.75k | £12.81k | £21.75k | £15.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 August 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED ON 29 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR BRASS BAND MUSIC IN ECCLES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF TUITION, PARTICULARLY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, AND THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ECCLES BAND ROOM
13 CORPORATION ROAD
ECCLES
MANCHESTER
M30 0EQ
- Phone:
- 01618651599
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window