BISHOP MIDDLEHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1174380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Bishop Middleham without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: (a) meetings, lectures and classes, and (b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £72,917
Total expenditure: £62,802

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jenifer Jane Brownlee Chair 30 November 2018
None on record
John Burrows Trustee 31 October 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE UPPER SKERNE
Received: On time
THE ROTARY CLUB OF GREAT AYCLIFFE TRUST FUND
Recently registered
Luke Andrew Bamford Trustee 31 October 2022
None on record
Jane Dove Trustee 24 August 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.17k £16.89k £58.52k £22.83k £72.92k
Total expenditure £10.58k £11.24k £42.17k £45.27k £62.80k
Income from government contracts £250 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.90k £55.54k £3.35k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Village Hall
Front Street
Bishop Middleham
FERRYHILL
County Durham
DL17 9AJ
Phone:
07795203091