THE RIFF RAFF SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Riff Raff Society aims to benefit individuals and families in our local area in need by reason of age, disability, ill health, financial hardship or other disadvantage. We raise money by organising events, and by generating sponsorship and donations. We use these funds to provide grants to achieve our charitable benefit and improve the lives of those we support.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 18 April 2017: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR ADVICE, EQUIPMENT, ACCOMMODATION, RESPITE AND OTHER SERVICES ACROSS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window