ATHELSTAN MUSEUM MALMESBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Athelstan Museum Malmesbury operates within Malmesbury Town Hall. It also owns and manages the Julia and Hans Rausing Building, a restored former Moravian Church at 12B Oxford Street in Malmesbury as a cultural and educational centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 August 2017: CIO registration
- 31 March 2023: Funds received from 284507 FRIENDS OF ATHELSTAN MUSEUM
- ATHELSTAN MUSEUM (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ATHELSTAN MUSEUM (Working name)
- MALMESBURY MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON NOLAN | Chair | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Overton | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Drake | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Steve D'Arcy | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Tucker | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Llewellyn Odlum | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony McAleavy | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Marsh | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Angela Sykes | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Griffin | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dave Heiland | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Casselden | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £699.12k | £95.28k | £80.32k | £42.68k | £50.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £650.99k | £70.19k | £51.59k | £38.98k | £25.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £26.37k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £679.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £57 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £36.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £602.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE ATHELSTAN MUSEUM AND COLLECTION FOR THE RECREATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF MALMESBURY ITS AREA AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Athelstan Museum
Town Hall
Cross Hayes
MALMESBURY
SN16 9BZ
- Phone:
- 01666 829258
- Email:
- info@athelstanmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window