THE KAMBIA APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are the preservation of health and the relief of sickness and need by providing medical and other equipment and medical and educational assistance for the people of Sierra Leone generally and of the Kambia District of Sierra Leone specifically.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 17 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHONA ELIZABETH LOCKYER | Chair | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Alice Jane Kallaway | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr MILES HARVEY WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Henry James Kerr-Wilson | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Terrance David Smith BA OX,CPFA | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
David McKenzie Holmes BSc FRCOG | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.69k | £9.33k | £10.60k | £12.85k | £10.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.78k | £28.68k | £11.64k | £12.08k | £17.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 17 MAR 2017 AMENDED ON 08 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND NEED BY PROVIDING MEDICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT AND MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE PEOPLE OF SIERRA LEONE GENERALLY AND OF THE KAMBIA DISTRICT OF SIERRA LEONE SPECIFICALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 OXMOOR
ABBEYDALE
GLOUCESTER
GL4 5XW
- Phone:
- 07999752096
- Email:
- info@kambia.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window