THE ALVINGTON SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A four-part choir of about 35 members, based in Kingsbridge, who perform concerts of mainly classical music in South Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 29 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harry Oliphant Forrester | Chair | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Elizabeth Genevieve Woodham | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth George | Trustee | 27 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Marion Glyn Baker | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette May Robbins | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan James Mcilhenny | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Mary Board | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Margaret Helen Stephens | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pennie Brown | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.40k | £1.00k | £4.51k | £7.90k | £8.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.04k | £664 | £5.29k | £7.77k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 SEP 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: (I) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; (II) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Beechwood Drive
KINGSBRIDGE
Devon
TQ7 1RR
- Phone:
- 07974 952890
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window