MEGAN'S RAINBOW SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and protect the physical and mental health of people living in County Durham, in particular but not limited to children and young adults who have experienced the loss of a family member by providing and assisting in the provision of services relating to bereavement including advice, counselling, emotional support and pratical help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 18 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER ANN BELL | Chair | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|||||
CAROL ANNE COCKERILL | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA FRENCH JOHNSON | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER EDWARD BELL | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH RICHARDSON | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18 | £5 | £0 | £2.02k | £75 | |
|
Total expenditure | £320 | £502 | £1.15k | £500 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN COUNTY DURHAM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED THE LOSS OF A FAMILY MEMBER BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES RELATING TO BEREAVEMENT INCLUDING ADVICE, COUNSELLING, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL HELP
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 PRINCESS ROAD
SEAHAM
SR7 7QX
- Phone:
- 01915812398
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window