GREATER MANCHESTER PAKISTANI ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of community centre and charitable activities to benefit people in Greater Manchester. We provide services such as advice, information and guidance along with training and educational support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £4,220 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 30 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haroon Afzal | Chair | 21 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Sheraz Haider | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esha Mumtaz | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.68k | £17.51k | £38.24k | £57.99k | £53.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.46k | £39.20k | £33.15k | £50.59k | £46.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2025 | 629 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 March 2025 | 629 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 December 2022 | 541 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 December 2022 | 541 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pakistani Community Association
481 Stockport Road
MANCHESTER
M12 4NN
- Phone:
- 01616370710
- Email:
- HAROON@GMPA.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window