THE DUSTY YAK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the poverty, advance the education and protect and preserve the health of orphan, neglected, impoverished and/or sick children in need in Nepal and elsewhere in the world suffering from such hardship and distress through the provision of basic necessities (care, accommodation, clothing, food and medicine), educational tuition and equipment and the making of grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nepal
Governance
- 09 May 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PETER DYKES | Chair | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Acloque | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW WILLIAM HURLEY | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.14k | £36.00k | £88.06k | £24.29k | £173.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.70k | £31.00k | £67.25k | £72.85k | £80.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 01 December 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 01 December 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF ORPHAN, NEGLECTED, IMPOVERISHED AND/OR SICK CHILDREN IN NEED IN NEPAL AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD SUFFERING FROM SUCH HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A) BASIC NECESSITIES SUCH AS CARE, ACCOMMODATION, CLOTHING, FOOD AND MEDICINE; B) EDUCATIONAL TUITION AND EQUIPMENT AND THE MAKING OF GRANTS; AND C) FINANCIAL, MATERIAL AND LOGISTICAL SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS WHO WORK WITH SUCH ORPHAN, NEGLECTED, IMPOVERISHED AND/OR SICK CHILDREN IN ORDER TO HELP BUILD OR IMPROVE THEIR ACCOMMODATION, SCHOOLS AND LIVING CONDITIONS IN GENERAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sequel House
The Hart
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU9 7HW
- Phone:
- 07836361600
- Email:
- lou.hurley@dustyyak.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window