GLOUCESTER CULTURE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GCT aims to put culture at the heart of Gloucester for the good of all. We work in partnership locally, regionally and nationally to create, test and deliver projects which will make Gloucester a city full of art and heritage. We want our city to be known for its distinctive culture: innovative and excellent, quirky and edgy, diverse and community-based with a strong focus on young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Lutman | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Catherine Courtney | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Powell | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikolas Venios | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cherrelle Ford | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clair Elizabeth Greenway | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mary Brady | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Belson-Read | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Gibbs | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Heidi Taylor | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esther Laura Croft | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.94k | £493.47k | £450.37k | £114.78k | £231.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.28k | £391.22k | £402.40k | £214.19k | £234.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.07k | £63.75k | £20.00k | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Mar 2018 as amended on 14 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
The following objects shall be carried out for the public benefit In the City of Gloucester and the surrounding area: 1) To promote, improve and advance public appreciation of the arts, culture and heritage, in particular but not exclusively by: a) Encouraging public participation in the arts, culture and creative practice through the provision of facilities and the facilitation and management of workshops and creative projects, and by the presentation of concerts, performances, exhibitions, festivals and events demonstrating work of artistic merit. b) Supporting charities, arts, heritage and creative organisations and not for profit bodies and individuals engaged in the provision of artistic, creative, and cultural activities and events. 2) To advance education in the arts, culture, art and cultural history and heritage of the City of Gloucester, and in the skills and competencies necessary to develop successful creative public benefit enterprises by the provision of training, lectures, talks, workshops, arts and heritage projects, performances and exhibitions and by publishing and distributing publications. 3) To relieve those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage by assisting unestablished creative practitioners to become self-supporting through their work. 4) To further or benefit the residents of the City of Gloucester and the surrounding area, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation or race, or of political, religious or other opinions, by associating together the said residents and local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents. Nothing in this constitution shall authorise an application of the property of the CIO for the purposes which are not charitable.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jolt
First Floor King's House
27 St. Aldate Street
King's Square
GLOUCESTER
GL1 1RP
- Phone:
- 07912999062
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window