Financial history Westcott Village Hall Trust

Charity number: 1172629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.97k £20.37k £38.62k £22.06k £17.89k
Total expenditure £20.99k £26.92k £20.15k £19.99k £113.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.95k N/A N/A