Westcott Village Hall Trust

Charity Number: 1172629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Westcott Reading Room provides facilities for a wide range of leisure and recreational activities and social events which are well promoted and easily accessible to all members of the local community through the ownership, maintenance, development and operation of our building to provide a community space which is available for hire to all.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £17,893
Total expenditure: £113,959

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 September 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WESTCOTT READING ROOM TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Brodrick Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Andrew Gray Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Tony Winch Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Andrew Paul Taylor Trustee 05 April 2023
None on record
Deborah Lewis Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Dr Helen Elizabeth Everett Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
SALLY HEWETSON Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.97k £20.37k £38.62k £22.06k £17.89k
Total expenditure £20.99k £26.92k £20.15k £19.99k £113.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.95k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 January 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 20 FEBRUARY 1959 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF A VILLAGE HALL WITH ASSOCIATED AMENITIES BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WESTCOTT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 06 September 1961 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Institute Road
Westcott
Surrey
RH4 3NP
Phone:
07967286636