CHILDREN'S WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's World uses performance, drama and fun to support disadvantaged children - helping them, their families, carers, teachers and communities with the challenges they face. We aim to reach children of all abilities, particularly those with special needs or additional barriers to access, by providing accessible, engaging, and enriching arts based learning experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,496 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE BUSBY | Chair | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Carruthers | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MAGGIE DEAR | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CASEY | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HAGGIS MCLEOD | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.11k | £124.81k | £43.73k | £81.00k | £90.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.29k | £69.96k | £94.74k | £94.09k | £89.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £10.00k | £1.77k | £1.58k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Mar 2017 as amended on 07 Feb 2024 as amended on 10 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL WELL-BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Northload Street
Glastonbury
BA6 9JJ
- Phone:
- 01458833693
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window