Financial history ALNWICK TOWN JUNIORS FC

Charity number: 1172758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £496.27k £164.70k £187.00k £177.11k £133.28k
Total expenditure £428.44k £171.10k £199.00k £170.27k £95.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £173.97k £5.50k N/A N/A N/A