OXFORD ACADEMIC HEALTH PARTNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Share information and raise awareness and carry out training programmes involved in clinical, health and/or social care; supporting clinical, health and/or social care staff and research including making grants; work with industry, charities, universities, the health service and any other relevant bodies to assist the progress of scientific discoveries, clinical breakthroughs and new technologies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Surrey
- Swindon
- Warwickshire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Crowther | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
OXFORD ACADEMIC HEALTH SCIENCE CENTRE (OAHP) | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oxford Brookes University | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Health Innovation Oxford and Thames Valley | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
University of Oxford | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oxford Health NHS Foundation Trust | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £30.00k | £41.20k | £22.60k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £25.44k | £56.89k | £8.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HEALTH BY RESEARCH, CLINICAL CARE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PROVIDE SOLUTIONS SO THAT MEDICAL RESEARCH BREAKTHROUGHS LEAD TO DIRECT CLINICAL BENEFITS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND OPPORTUNITIES TO SHARE INFORMATION BETWEEN ALL MEMBERS OF THE MEDICAL FIELD AND/OR HEALTH CARE SYSTEM INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PATIENTS, CLINICIANS, MEDICAL PROVIDERS, RESEARCHERS, HEALTH SERVICES; (B) RAISING AWARENESS AND CARRYING OUT TRAINING PROGRAMMES INVOLVED IN CLINICAL, HEALTH AND/OR SOCIAL CARE; (C) SUPPORTING CLINICAL, HEALTH AND/OR SOCIAL CARE RESEARCH OR RESEARCH DIRECTLY RELATED TO CLINICAL, HEALTH AND/OR SOCIAL CARE AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I) DISEASES (BOTH CHRONIC AND ACUTE), IMMUNE RESPONSES, INFECTIONS; (II) TREATMENTS; (III) DRUGS; (IV) DIAGNOSTICS; (V) INTEGRATING HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS; (VI) ANY OTHER TECHNOLOGIES; (D) MAKING GRANTS TO PROJECTS INVOLVED IN CLINICAL, HEALTH AND/OR SOCIAL CARE RESEARCH; (E) PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND/OR TRAINING TO HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS, PATIENTS AND ANY USERS OF THE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM; (F) PROGRESSING TECHNOLOGIES, THERAPIES AND TREATMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF HUMAN HEALTH; (G) WORKING WITH INDUSTRY, CHARITIES, UNIVERSITIES, THE HEALTH SERVICE AND ANY OTHER RELEVANT BODIES TO ASSIST THE PROGRESS OF SCIENTIFIC DISCOVERIES, MEDICAL BREAKTHROUGHS AND NEW TECHNOLOGIES; (H) SUPPORTING INNOVATION AND IMPROVEMENT IN CLINICAL, HEALTH AND/OR SOCIAL CARE SERVICE DELIVERY INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I) DISEASES (BOTH CHRONIC AND ACUTE), IMMUNE RESPONSES, INFECTIONS; (II) TREATMENTS; (III) DRUGS; (IV) DIAGNOSTICS; (V) INTEGRATING HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS; (VI) ANY OTHER TECHNOLOGIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Joint Research Office OUH Cowley
1st Floor Unipart House
Garsington Road
OXFORD
Care of Dr Sara Ward
OX4 2PG
- Phone:
- 07837 401519
- Email:
- megan.turmezei@ouh.nhs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window