Accounts and annual returns UK COMPASSION ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1174058
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 04 March 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 04 March 2025 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 19 January 2025 325 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 21 January 2025 327 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 07 April 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 21 January 2025 693 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 01 February 2023 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 21 January 2025 1058 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 March 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1545 days Download Open in new window