Financial history UK COMPASSION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1174058
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £40.36k £7.92k £16.16k £23.85k £8.57k
Total expenditure £74.88k £2.69k £10.33k £31.64k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A