Accounts and annual returns GOOD FOOD LLANEDEYRN

Charity number: 1174937
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 10 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 10 February 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 August 2024 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 August 2024 196 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window