GOOD FOOD LLANEDEYRN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the capacity and skills of the members of the socially and economically disadvantaged community of Llanedeyrn in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 2017: CIO registration
- LLANEDEYRN HUB CAFE (Working name)
- POWERHOUSE CAFE (Working name)
- POWERHOUSE COMMUNITY CAFE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CHRISTOPHER MARK LAWSON - JONES MA | Chair | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Corrina Tracy Rundle | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eveline Rundle | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gower | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|||||
JENNY RATHBONE | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £145 | £0 | £2.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £36 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF LLANEDEYRN IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Princes Avenue
CARDIFF
CF24 3SN
- Phone:
- 07540 966166
- Email:
- goodfoodllanedeyrn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window