SOUTHOWRAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1172019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To benefit all residents of Southowram and the neighbourhood, by bringing together the residents, local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare,recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of maintaining and/or improving the conditions of life for the residents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,866
Total expenditure: £13,025

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 2017: CIO registration
  • 04 November 2017: Funds received from 1002993 SOUTHOWRAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colonel Stephen Padgett OBE Chair 01 August 2017
YORK ARMY MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE PRINCE OF WALES'S OWN REGIMENT OF YORKSHIRE MUSEUM CHARITY
Received: On time
Piers Greenwood Trustee 03 August 2019
None on record
Amanda Helen Padgett Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.64k £24.74k £21.01k £7.16k £10.87k
Total expenditure £6.15k £20.27k £6.49k £5.71k £13.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.07k £12.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Colburn Hall
Bank Top
Southowram
Halifax
HX3 9UB
Phone:
07709 781983
Website:

No information available