Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR RADIOLOGICAL PROTECTION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1172201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Christopher Robin Sallit Chair 16 March 2021
None on record
Robert Ian Storrie Trustee 09 August 2024
None on record
Keith Faulkner Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
David Webbe-Wood Trustee 28 July 2024
None on record
SIMON CLARK Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record