SAMARITAN ESTHER'S COMMUNITY CARE UK (SECCA -UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SECCA-UK exists to relieve the suffering of widows, children and other vulnerable groups through provision of food, water, shelter and accessible health services. We integrate self-sufficiency and sustainability principles in all interventions. By raising funds through various events , grants proposals and working through SECCA Malawi and other charitable organisations with similar vision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Malawi
Governance
- 04 August 2017: CIO registration
- SAMARITAN ESTHER'S COMMUNITY CARE (SECCA -UK) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr AUBREY MAKHALIRA | Chair | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr BERN-THOMAS BERNARD NYANG'WA | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
NANCY SEYANI | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA NGUSIMONGWA MEMBE-MAKHALIRA | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAGGIE NYANG'WA | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PILIRANI NDASILE LINLEY SEYANI | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.05k | £8.19k | £8.89k | £11.67k | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94k | £3.68k | £5.88k | £7.35k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN MALAWI AND OTHER REGIONS OF AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG ORPHANS AND WIDOWS BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND SERVICES TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND WIDOWS IN MALAWI AND OTHER REGIONS OF AFRICA IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES. 3. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN MALAWI AND OTHER REGIONS OF AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG ORPHANS AND WIDOWS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLEAN WATER, PROMOTION OF FOOD PRODUCTION AND HEALTH CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
168 Lockwood Scar
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 6EA
- Phone:
- 07930649417
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window