ICU SURVIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding for research to improve understanding of diseases relevant to intensive care and delivery of intensive care. Improving the lives of patients undergoing intensive care, psychologically and physically. Improving efficiency and working conditions for staff providing intensive care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ELIZABETH POTTER | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Benedict Creagh-Brown | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nancileigh Doyle | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wild | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Kirk-Bayley | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2024 | 731 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 416 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2024 | 1096 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS IN NEED OF INTENSIVE CARE IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE ROYAL SURREY COUNTY HOSPITAL. TO ACQUIRE EQUIPMENT AND APPARATUS AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE INTENSIVE CARE OF PERSONS REQUIRING SUCH CARE IN SUCH AREA. TO CARRY OUT AND MAKE GRANTS FOR CHARITABLE RESEARCH INTO INTENSIVE CARE IN SUCH AREA AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Surrey County Hospital
Egerton Road
Guildford
GU2 7XX
- Phone:
- 0796731562
- Email:
- elizabeth.potter4@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window