Accounts and annual returns EIFA PARENTS

Charity number: 1172779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 February 2025 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 07 February 2025 222 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 February 2025 587 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 February 2025 587 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required