ADOPT A POTTER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of student ceramicist at Clay College, Stoke, by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for ceramics education at that college.Providing support to enable ceramicists to take up training apprenticeships with experienced potters, thereby to furnish the apprentice ceramicists with practical experience and training. Increase public awareness of Studio Ceramics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 May 2017: Standard registration
- 25 January 2020: Funds received from 1130164 ADOPT A POTTER TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Jean Hammond | Chair | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julian Miller | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Allen Rod Mearing | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Jill Wells | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren Lee Ellis | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
lesley cartmell | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA SEATON | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.88k | £190.75k | £180.35k | £226.67k | £246.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.09k | £164.64k | £196.05k | £185.34k | £245.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 FEB 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (I) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF STUDENT CERAMICISTS AT CLAY COLLEGE, STOKE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CERAMICS EDUCATION AT THAT COLLEGE. (II) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ENABLE CERAMICISTS TO KEEP UP TRAINING APPRENTICESHIPS WITH EXPERIENCED POTTERS, THEREBY TO FURNISH THE APPRENTICE WITH PRACTICAL EXPERIENCE AND TRAINING. (III) TO DEVELOP THE PRACTICAL SKILLS, CREATIVE DIRECTION AND VISION OF THE APPRENTICE CERAMICISTS THROUGH MENTORING AND DIRECTION FROM THE EXPERIENCED POTTERS. (IV) THEREBY FIT THE APPRENTICE POTTERS TO PRACTICE AS CERAMICISTS AND CONTRIBUTE TO THE CONTINUED GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF CERAMIC ART. (V) DEVELOP THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE CERAMIC ARTS TROUGH EXPOSURE TO THE WORK OF THE APRENTICE POTTERS AND THROUGH PUBLIC COURSES TO BE HELD AT CLAY COLLEGE, STOKE ON TRENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maze Hill Pottery
The Old Ticket Office
Woodlands Park Road
LONDON
SE10 9XE
- Phone:
- 07973419128
- Email:
- mail.adoptapotter@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window