Financial history NORTH SHIELDS POLYTECHNIC CLUB

Charity number: 1175041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £89.29k £39.42k £70.19k £106.83k £125.63k
Total expenditure £67.92k £31.54k £100.01k £151.43k £99.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A