Trustees NORTH SHIELDS POLYTECHNIC CLUB
Charity number: 1175041
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Helen Tindle | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hope | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lourdes Bradley | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Penfold | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven William Colby | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jamison | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Philip Richard Willcox | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Harmon Lewis-Dale | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Sutcliffe | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.