Accounts and annual returns SBMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177419
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 05 November 2024 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 05 November 2024 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 18 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 28 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 26 March 2022 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 26 March 2022 207 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 September 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 21 September 2020 21 days late Download Open in new window