LEGBOURNE AND LITTLE CAWTHORPE COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity exists to provide a venue for other organisations within and without the two villages to use. It also arranges social events most of which also raise funds for the running of the community centre and recreation ground.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 April 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Loveley | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Murray | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Northover | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Exley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Victor Peck | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jon Marvin | Trustee | 22 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SHARON POCKLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.03k | £26.40k | £23.30k | £22.14k | £18.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.65k | £16.55k | £16.20k | £32.32k | £25.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | £10.67k | N/A | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THEUSE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF LEGBOURNE AND LITTLE CAWTHORPE(HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES,AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION,WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE LIFE FORTHE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LEGBOURNE AND LITTLE CAWTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Yews
Station Road
Legbourne
LOUTH
Lincolnshire
LN11 8LH
- Phone:
- 01507604171
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window