CHADDY MISSION (KENYA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support 'Chaddy Mission School' in Mwariki slum Nakuru Kenya. We support children and staff at the School with free quality education and feeding program . We fundraise to support the daily running costs of the school and to support the community of the Mwariki slum. We are based in the UK and support by fundraising,donations, sponsorship, and voluntary work attendance and annual visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 05 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER LOUISE ROBERTS | Chair | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Salt | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Haslam | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Kanya MSc PhD | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick SAVILL Tech.IOSH | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZOE CARTER | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.80k | £6.85k | £7.05k | £6.76k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.54k | £6.75k | £6.10k | £7.11k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHILDREN AT THE "CHADDY MISSION", IN THE MWARIKI DISTRICT OF NAKURU, KENYA ; THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THE RESOURCES TO SUPPORT THEIR LEARNING AND WELFARE. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES: (1) BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE "CHADDY MISSION" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN THE MWARIKI DISTRICT OF NAKURU, KENYA ; THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. (2) SUPPORT THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION AND COUNSELLING TO PARENTS, AND THEIR CHILDREN AT "CHADDY MISSION"; AND SUPPORTING THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION AND COUNSELLING HELD AT "CHADDY MISSION" FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE COMMUNITY OF MWARIKI DISTRICT, NAKURU, KENYA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Sprucewood
Chadderton
OLDHAM
OL9 9UA
- Phone:
- 07891994540
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window