Accounts and annual returns THE LIONS BARBER COLLECTIVE

Charity number: 1176363
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 November 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 February 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 February 2022 17 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late