THE LIONS BARBER COLLECTIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness for mental well being and suicide prevention. Encouraging barbers to create a safe place for men to open up and offload and being able to signpost to already existing charities and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 December 2017: CIO registration
- 07 April 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 07 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1196817 DAVID RIDDELL MEMORIAL CIO
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.24k | £156.74k | £120.11k | £179.55k | £222.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.24k | £156.74k | £120.11k | £141.02k | £228.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.18k | £30.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY: RAISING AWARENESS OF AND PROVIDING TRAINING ON THE CAUSES AND EFFECT OF SUICIDE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CONCERNING MEN. PROMOTING A BETTER UNDERSTANDING IN SOCIETY OF SUICIDE, SUICIDAL BEHAVIOUR AND THE VALUE OF EXPRESSING FEELINGS WHICH MAY OTHERWISE LEAD TO SUICIDE OR IMPAIRED EMOTIONAL HEALTH THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY: REDUCING THE RISK AND OCCURRENCES OF MALE SUICIDE BY OFFERING ASSISTANCE TO THEM, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR PEOPLE WHO CARE FOR THEM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window