SPINAL TRACK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a selection of driving experiences to those who require adaptions to drive i.e hand controls, left foot throttle, wheel adaptions. Our experiences are free of charge to the beneficiary. We supply the highest quality experiences not available elsewhere using highly qualified instructors and top specification vehicles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 2017: Standard registration
- 25 September 2019: Funds received from 1115185 THE RICHARD BURNS FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Solomons | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Simpson | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Evans | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.09k | £81.23k | £88.05k | £70.88k | £108.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.41k | £33.34k | £24.19k | £82.67k | £61.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 February 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 February 2021 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES WHETHER ACQUIRED AT BIRTH, IN CHILD HOOD OR IN ADULT LIFE, WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE EXCLUDED BY ENABLING THEM TO ENJOY THE PLEASURES AND BENEFITS OF TAKING PART IN MOTOR SPORTS TRACK EVENTS, BY THE PROVISION OF ADAPTED AND MODIFIED VEHICLES, ALONGSIDE OTHER PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Irwin Mitchell Llp
Thomas Eggar House
Friary Lane
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 1UF
- Phone:
- 07870 138356
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window